US SB3508 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-265.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Save Our Seas Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-11HouseBecame Public Law No: 115-265.
2018-10-11HouseSigned by President.
2018-10-02HousePresented to President.
2018-09-27HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-09-27HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-27HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9135-9138)
2018-09-27HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9135-9138)
2018-09-27HouseMr. Denham asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2018-09-27HouseHeld at the desk.
2018-09-27HouseReceived in the House.
2018-09-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6330-6334; text: CR S6331-6334)

Same As/Similar To

HB6175 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 798.
HB6206 (Related) 2018-11-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 799.
SB756 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.

Subjects

Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Business records
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Department of Homeland Security
Department of State
Department of the Interior
Economic performance and conditions
Emergency communications systems
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Great Lakes
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Materials
Research and development
Solid waste and recycling
Trade agreements and negotiations
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback