US SB3505 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to authorize the ordering of units of the Selected Reserve to active duty to respond to significant cyber incidents, and for other purposes.
Title
Defense Support for Cyber Emergencies Response Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2670 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 118-31.
SB2153 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
SB2153 (Related) 2023-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2226 (Related) 2023-07-27 - Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3505/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3505/BILLS-118s3505is.pdf |