US SB35 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Became Public Law No: 115-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Became Public Law No: 115-175.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) complete environmental, cultural resource, and other due diligence activities on certain federal land to confirm its suitability for inclusion in the Black Hills National Cemetery, South Dakota; and (2) notify, and coordinate with, the Department of the Interior regarding such activities. After completion of such activities and upon receipt by Interior of written confirmation of suitability from the VA, the land shall: (1) be withdrawn from all forms of appropriation under the public land laws, including the mining laws, the mineral leasing laws, and the geothermal leasing laws, for as long as it remains under VA administrative jurisdiction; (2) be treated as property; and (3) be transferred, except for the land within 100 feet of the center of the Centennial Trail, from Interior to the VA for use as a national cemetery. Interior shall publish a notice containing the legal descriptions of such transferred land. The VA shall reimburse Interior for reasonable transfer costs, including survey costs. The cemetery's boundary is modified to include such federal land.
Title
Black Hills National Cemetery Boundary Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 187 (Y: 407 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-175. |
2018-05-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-05-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-05-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 187). (text: CR 5/16/2018 H3951-3952) |
2018-05-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (CR H4008) |
2018-05-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-05-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 35. |
2018-05-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3951-3953) |
2018-05-15 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 479. |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-626, Part I. |
2018-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-12-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8267-8268) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 49. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-35. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2414 (Related) 2018-02-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Cemeteries and funerals
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
South Dakota
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Land transfers
Public lands and natural resources
South Dakota
Veterans' organizations and recognition