US SB348 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Drug and Health Improvement Act of 2017 This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to negotiate lower prices on behalf of Medicare and Medicare Advantage (MA) beneficiaries for covered prescription drugs that the CMS deems appropriate for negotiation based on: (1) program and per-beneficiary spending, (2) unit price increases over the preceding years, (3) initial launch price, (4) availability of similarly effective alternative treatments, (5) status of the drug as a follow-on to previously approved drugs, and (6) any other criteria determined by the CMS. If, after a one year period, negotiations with respect to a covered prescription drug prove unsuccessful, the CMS shall establish a price for the drug that is equal to the lesser of the price paid by the Department of Veterans Affairs or the price paid by the four largest federal pharmaceutical-drug purchasers. The CMS may (but is not required to) negotiate lower prices on behalf of Medicare and MA beneficiaries for other covered prescription drugs. The Government Accountability Office must report to Congress on the CMS' negotiations. The Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation must test several specified models for negotiating drug and biological prices.
Title
Prescription Drug and Health Improvement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1776 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB771 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB771 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1688 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Medical research
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Medical research
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/348/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s348/BILLS-115s348is.pdf |