US SB346 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the United States Geological Survey (USGS) to establish the National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System to monitor, issue warnings of, and protect U.S. citizens from undue and avoidable harm from, volcanic activity. The purposes of the system are to: (1) organize, modernize, standardize, and stabilize the monitoring systems of U.S. volcano observatories; and (2) unify such systems into a single interoperative system. The objective of the system is to monitor all U.S. volcanoes at a level commensurate with the threat posed by the volcanoes by: (1) upgrading existing networks on monitored volcanoes, (2) installing new networks on unmonitored volcanoes, and (3) employing geodetic and other components when applicable. The system shall include: (1) a national volcano watch office that is operational 24 hours a day and 7 days a week, (2) a national volcano data center, (3) an external grants program to support research in volcano monitoring science and technology, and (4) modernization activities including the comprehensive application of emerging technologies. The USGS must: (1) submit to Congress a five-year management plan for establishing and operating the system, (2) establish an advisory committee to assist in implementing the system, and (3) report to Congress annually describing the activities carried out under this bill. The USGS may enter into cooperative agreements designating institutions of higher education and state agencies as volcano observatory partners for the system. (Sec. 4) The bill authorizes appropriations for FY2019-FY2023.
Title
National Volcano Early Warning and Monitoring System Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-05-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (text as passed Senate: CR S3777-3778) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2252 Amendment SA 2252 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2252 Amendment SA 2252 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S2777; text: CR S2777) To modify the authorization of appropriations. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | The committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text of measure as reported to Senate: CR S3776-3777) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3776-3778) |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-113. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S968-969) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4475 (Related) 2018-01-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 374.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Department of the Interior
Earth sciences
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Research administration and funding
Department of the Interior
Earth sciences
Emergency communications systems
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Research administration and funding