US SB3456 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to redesignate Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge as the Nathaniel P. Reed Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to redesignate Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge as the Nathaniel P. Reed Hobe Sound National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 496 (Y: 365 N: 5 NV: 62 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 365 - 5, 2 Present (Roll no. 496). (text: CR H10560) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10579-10580) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3456. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10560) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7898) |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Subjects
Florida
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats