US SB3453 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5492)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5492)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2012 - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (FLSA) to increase the federal minimum wage for employees to: (1) $8.10 an hour on the first day of the third month after the enactment of this Act; (2) $8.95 an hour after one year; (3) $9.80 an hour after two years; and (4) the amount determined by the Secretary of Labor (based on increases in the Consumer Price Index) after three years, and annually thereafter. Increases the federal minimum wage for tipped employees to $3.00 an hour for one year on the first day of the third month after the enactment of this Act. Provides a formula for subsequent annual adjustments of the wage increase to ensure that it remains equal to 70% of the wage in effect under FLSA for other employees. Directs the Secretary of Labor, 60 days before any increase in the minimum wage, to publish it in the Federal Register and on the Department of Labor's website.
Title
Fair Minimum Wage Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] | Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jim Webb [D-VA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5492) |
2012-07-26 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5491-5492) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5727 (Related) 2012-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB6211 (Same As) 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB2252 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6211 (Same As) 2012-09-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB2252 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Labor
Inflation and prices
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Wages and earnings
Department of Labor
Inflation and prices
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/3453/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s3453/BILLS-112s3453is.pdf |