US SB3422 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nuclear Energy Leadership Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nuclear Energy Leadership Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2018-09-06SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB4378 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5260 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB1457 (Related) 2018-05-21 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 418.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback