US SB341 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-55.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Russia Sanctions Review Act of 2017 This bill provides that the following executive orders, as in effect on January 1, 2017, and any sanctions imposed pursuant to such orders, shall remain in effect: (1) Executive Order 13694 (relating to blocking property of certain persons engaging in significant malicious cyber-enabled activities); (2) Executive Orders 13660, 13661, and 13662 (relating to blocking property of certain persons contributing to the situation in Ukraine); and (3) Executive Order 13685 (relating to blocking property of certain persons and prohibiting certain transactions with respect to the Crimea region of Ukraine). Before taking any action to waive or otherwise limit the application of sanctions with respect to the Russian Federation, the President shall submit to specified congressional committees a report that: (1) describes the proposed action; and (2) certifies that the Russian government has ceased ordering or supporting acts intended to undermine Ukraine's peace, security, stability,sovereignty, or territorial integrity and has ceased cyber attacks against the U.S. government and U.S. persons and entities. During the 120-day period following a report's submission: (1) the Senate Committee on Foreign Relations and the House Committee on Foreign Affairs shall review such report and certification, and (2) the President may not take action to waive or otherwise limit the application of such sanctions. The President may not take action to waive or otherwise limit the application of sanctions with respect to the Russian Federation: (1) for 12 days after the date of passage by both Houses of Congress of a congressional joint resolution disapproving such action, (2) for 10 days after the the President vetoes such joint resolution, and (3) if such joint resolution is enacted as provided for by this bill.
Title
Russia Sanctions Review Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-55. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1059 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB2935 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
HB2935 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Europe
Foreign property
International affairs
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Europe
Foreign property
International affairs
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade restrictions
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
Visas and passports
War and emergency powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/341/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s341/BILLS-115s341is.pdf |