US SB334 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Water for Rural Communities Act This bill authorizes rural water supply projects in Montana and North Dakota. Specifically, the bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to (1) plan and construct the Musselshell-Judith Rural Water System for certain communities in Montana, and (2) study the feasibility of constructing the Dry-Redwater Regional Water System for certain communities in Montana and North Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Water for Rural Communities Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 253.
2019-10-22SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 116-133.
2019-09-25SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-02-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB967 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback