US SB3331 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-14 - Became Public Law No: 112-276.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Intercountry Adoption Universal Accreditation Act of 2012 - Applies universal intercountry adoption accreditation standards under the Intercountry Adoption Act of 2000, and related regulations, to the same extent as they apply to the offering or provision of adoption services in connection with an adoption under the Convention on Protection of Children and Co-operation in Respect of Intercountry Adoption to any person offering or providing adoption services in connection with a foreign orphan under age 16 adopted or to be adopted by a U.S. citizen. Gives the Secretary of State, the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS), the Attorney General, and the accrediting entities the duties, responsibilities, and authorities under the Intercountry Adoption Act of 2000 and related regulations with respect to a person offering or providing such adoption services, regardless of whether such services are offered or provided in connection with a Convention adoption. Amends the Intercountry Adoption Act of 2000 to: (1) repeal the prohibition against, and so make available, collected fees to accrediting entities; and (2) add a congressional report requirement on the use of federal funding.
Title
Intercountry Adoption Universal Accreditation Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | House | Became Public Law No: 112-276. |
2013-01-14 | House | Signed by President. |
2013-01-03 | House | Presented to President. |
2013-01-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-01-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/30/2012 H7457) |
2013-01-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7559-7560) |
2012-12-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Ms. Ros-Lehtinen objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3331. |
2012-12-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7457-7458) |
2012-12-30 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-12-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2012-12-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2012-12-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2012-12-05 | Senate | S.AMDT.3310 Amendment SA 3310 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-12-05 | Senate | S.AMDT.3310 Amendment SA 3310 proposed by Senator Cardin for Senator Kerry. (consideration: CR S7636-7637; text: CR S7636-7637)In the nature of a substitute. |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7636-7637) |
2012-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 539. |
2012-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. With written report No. 112-234. |
2012-09-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2012-06-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6027 (Same As) 2012-06-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
User charges and fees
Immigration status and procedures
International affairs
International law and treaties
User charges and fees