US SB3296 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to delay the implementation of the final rules entitled "Lead; Renovation, Repair, and Painting Program; Lead Hazard Information Pamphlet; Notice of Availability; Final Rule" (published on April 22, 2008) and "Lead; Amendment to the Opt-out and Recordkeeping Provisions in the Renovation, Repair, and Painting Program" (signed by the Administrator on April 22, 2010) in each state until accredited certified renovator classes to train contractors in practices necessary for compliance with such rules have been held in such state for at least a year. Requires the Administrator to: (1) monitor each state to determine when such classes are offered; and (2) notify each Member of Congress about the location and time of each such class held in their state and the date on which the classes have been held for one year.
Title
A bill to delay the implementation of certain final rules of the Environmental Protection Agency in States until accreditation classes are held in the States for a period of at least 1 year.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Robert Bennett [R-UT] | Sen. Christopher Bond [R-MO] |
Sen. Scott Brown [R-MA] | Sen. Sam Brownback [R-KS] | Sen. Jim Bunning [R-KY] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
Sen. Saxby Chambliss [R-GA] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Judd Gregg [R-NH] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5177 (Same As) 2010-05-05 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3130)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child care and development
Child health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
Child care and development
Child health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/3296/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s3296/BILLS-111s3296is.pdf |