US SB329 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MERCY Act Maintaining dignity and Eliminating unnecessary Restrictive Confinement of Youths Act of 2017 This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit juvenile solitary confinement, except as a temporary response to behavior that poses a serious and immediate risk of harm.
Title
MERCY Act Maintaining dignity and Eliminating unnecessary Restrictive Confinement of Youths Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB901 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB827 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1906 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SB827 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1906 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Detention of persons
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Mental health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Detention of persons
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government studies and investigations
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Mental health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/329/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s329/BILLS-115s329is.pdf |