US SB321 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Became Public Law No: 117-97. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to the women of the 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion (commonly known as the Six Triple Eight) in recognition of their pioneering military service, devotion to duty, and contributions to increase the morale of personnel stationed in the European theater of operations during World War II.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Six Triple Eight" Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2021 "Six Triple Eight" Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2021

Sponsors

Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. James Risch [R-ID]
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]
Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN]Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]
Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS]
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]

Roll Calls

2022-02-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 422 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14SenateBecame Public Law No: 117-97. (TXT | PDF)
2022-03-14SenateSigned by President.
2022-03-03SenatePresented to President.
2022-02-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2022-02-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 46). (text: CR H1152-1153)
2022-02-28HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1170-1171)
2022-02-28HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2022-02-28HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 321.
2022-02-28HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1152-1155)
2022-02-28HouseMr. Perlmutter moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-05-04HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-05-04HouseReceived in the House.
2021-05-03SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2385)
2021-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2385)
2021-02-12SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1012 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback