US SB321 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 80.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 80.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to revoke the charter of incorporation of the Miami Tribe of Oklahoma at the request of that tribe, and for other purposes. Accepts the request of the Miami Tribe of Oklahoma to revoke the charter of incorporation issued to that tribe and ratified by its members on June 1, 1940.
Title
A bill to revoke the charter of incorporation of the Miami Tribe of Oklahoma at the request of that tribe, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 80. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 114-40. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB533 (Same As) 2015-07-06 - Became Public Law No: 114-28. (TXT | PDF)