US SB32 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument in Kentucky as a unit of the National Park System to preserve and interpret the nationally significant historic resources of the Mill Springs Battlefield and its role in the Civil War.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mill Springs Battlefield National Monument Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB240 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback