US SB32 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Became Public Law No: 114-154. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transnational Drug Trafficking Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to broaden the scope of persons subject to criminal prosecution for manufacturing or distributing a controlled substance in schedule I or II, a precursor chemical, or flunitrazepam for unlawful import into the United States. The Controlled Substances Act classifies drugs, substances, and chemicals used to make drugs into one of five schedules based on the drug's medical use, potential for abuse, and risk of dependence. Current law prohibits such manufacture or distribution by a person who knows or intends that the substance or chemical will be unlawfully imported. This bill broadens the scope to also prohibit such manufacture or distribution by a person who reasonably believes that the substance or chemical will be unlawfully imported. In addition, this bill prohibits the manufacture or distribution of a precursor chemical by a person who: (1) knows or intends that the chemical will be used to manufacture a controlled substance; and (2) knows, intends, or reasonably believes that the controlled substance will be unlawfully imported into the United States. (Sec. 3) The legislation amends the federal criminal code to replace statutory references to prohibited trafficking in a "counterfeit drug" with references to prohibited trafficking in a "drug that uses a counterfeit mark on or in connection with the drug."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transnational Drug Trafficking Act of 2015

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-16HouseBecame Public Law No: 114-154. (TXT | PDF)
2016-05-16HouseSigned by President.
2016-05-13HousePresented to President.
2016-05-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2016-05-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2175)
2016-05-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 32.
2016-05-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2175-2179)
2016-05-10HouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2015-11-17HouseCommittee on United States Senate Caucus on International Narcotics Control. Hearings held.
2015-11-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2015-10-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2015-10-08HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2015-10-08HouseReferred to House Judiciary
2015-10-08HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2015-10-08HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2015-10-08HouseReceived in the House.
2015-10-07SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7223; text as passed Senate: CR S7223)
2015-09-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 232.
2015-09-17SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report.
2015-09-17SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2015-01-13SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary by unanimous consent.
2015-01-13SenateSenate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2015-01-06SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S18-19)

Same As/Similar To

HB3380 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 469.
SB524 (Related) 2016-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-198. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback