US SB316 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S833)
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S833)
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta National Heritage Area in California. The Delta Protection Commission is designated as the local coordinating entity for the heritage area. The commission shall submit a proposed management plan for the heritage area to the Department of the Interior for approval. The management plan shall not be approved until Interior has received certification from the commission that the Delta Stewardship Council has reviewed such plan for consistency with the plan adopted by the council pursuant to state law.
Title
Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta National Heritage Area Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S833) |
Same As/Similar To
HB357 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/316/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s316/BILLS-116s316is.pdf |