US SB3153 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 115-298. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-11 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 115-298. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Matthew Young Pollard Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018 and 2019
Title
Matthew Young Pollard Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018 and 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-11 | Senate | By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 115-298. Additional views filed. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 494. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Select Committee on Intelligence. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Burr. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6237 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Received in the Senate.
HR989 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1761 (Related) 2017-09-07 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 115-151. Additional and Minority views filed.
SB3724 (Related) 2018-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
HR989 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1761 (Related) 2017-09-07 - By Senator Burr from Select Committee on Intelligence filed written report. Report No. 115-151. Additional and Minority views filed.
SB3724 (Related) 2018-12-06 - Read twice and referred to the Select Committee on Intelligence.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Budget process
California
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
China
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Director of National Intelligence
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Industrial facilities
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
International law and treaties
Internet and video services
Maryland
Minority employment
National Security Agency
New York State
Nuclear weapons
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Russia
Sanctions
Science and engineering education
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade secrets and economic espionage
Travel and tourism
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Visas and passports
Water use and supply
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Budget process
California
Central Intelligence Agency (CIA)
China
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Director of National Intelligence
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee hiring
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI)
Federal officials
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Higher education
Industrial facilities
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Intergovernmental relations
International law and treaties
Internet and video services
Maryland
Minority employment
National Security Agency
New York State
Nuclear weapons
Organized crime
Performance measurement
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Russia
Sanctions
Science and engineering education
State and local government operations
Subversive activities
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Technology assessment
Technology transfer and commercialization
Telephone and wireless communication
Trade secrets and economic espionage
Travel and tourism
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Visas and passports
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3153/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3153/BILLS-115s3153pcs.pdf |