US SB3132 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2027 the U.S. SAFE WEB Act of 2006, which permits the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) to take certain actions to protect consumers from cross-border fraud and deception occurring over the internet. The bill further requires the FTC to report on its activities concerning cross-border, online fraud and provide any policy recommendations to address such fraud.
Title
A bill to extend the Undertaking Spam, Spyware, And Fraud Enforcement With Enforcers beyond Borders Act of 2006, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 517. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-256. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4779 (Same As) 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-173. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Intergovernmental relations
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial procedure and administration