US SB310 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish an advisory group to encourage and foster collaborative efforts among individuals and entities engaged in disaster recovery relating to debris removal, and for other purposes.
Title
Disaster Contract Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-12-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6025-6026; text: CR S6026) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 64. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 118-24. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6997 (Same As) 2024-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.