US SB3085 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Acquisition Supply Chain Security Act of 2018
Title
Federal Acquisition Supply Chain Security Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4158 Amendment SA 4158 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | S.Amdt.4158 Amendment SA 4158 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator McCaskill. (consideration: CR S7813-7817; text: CR S7813-7817) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7809-7817; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S7809-7813) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | By Senator Johnson from Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs filed written report. Report No. 115-408. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 666. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7327 (Related) 2018-12-21 - Presented to President.
Subjects
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Telephone and wireless communication