US SB3057 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STOP Act of 2018 Synthetics Trafficking and Overdose Prevention Act of 2018
Title
STOP Act of 2018 Synthetics Trafficking and Overdose Prevention Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5788 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Similar To) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
International law and treaties
Postal service
Smuggling and trafficking
Terrorism
U.S. Postal Service
User charges and fees
Congressional oversight
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Government liability
Government studies and investigations
International law and treaties
Postal service
Smuggling and trafficking
Terrorism
U.S. Postal Service
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3057/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3057/BILLS-115s3057is.pdf |