US SB304 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-35.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013 - Requires the Secretary of the Interior to convey to Mississippi, by quitclaim deed and without consideration, all interest of the United States in two parcels of identified land totaling approximately 67 acres. Requires the deed of conveyance to the parcel of land located southeast of U.S. route 61/84, and which is commonly known as the bean field property, to reserve an easement to the United States that restricts the use of such parcel only to uses which are compatible with the Parkway. Adjusts the boundary of the Parkway to exclude the conveyed land and provides for inclusion in the Parkway of the approximately 10 acres identified as the proposed addition.
Title
Natchez Trace Parkway Land Conveyance Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 419 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-35. |
2013-09-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2013-09-12 | House | Presented to President. |
2013-09-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 453). (text: CR H5452) |
2013-09-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5458) |
2013-09-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-09-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 304. |
2013-09-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5452-5453) |
2013-09-10 | House | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-09-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 138. |
2013-09-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-191. |
2013-07-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-07-19 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-06-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4720-4721) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 56. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-25. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Land transfers
Mississippi
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Mississippi
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways