US SB3015 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
John Thomas Decker Act of 2016 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to report on the availability of information regarding prescription of opioids after youth sports injury, including information on opioid use and misuse, injury treatments that do not involve opioids, and treatment for opioid addiction. (Opioids are drugs with effects similar to opium, such as heroin and certain pain medications.) The report must determine the extent this information is available to teenagers and adolescents who play youth sports, their families, youth sports groups, and health care providers. Taking into consideration the findings of the report, HHS must develop and disseminate such information.
Title
John Thomas Decker Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4969 (Related) 2016-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5189 (Related) 2016-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB524 (Related) 2016-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-198. (TXT | PDF)
HB5189 (Related) 2016-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB524 (Related) 2016-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-198. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Athletes
Child health
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Health
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Prescription drugs
School athletics
Child health
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Elementary and secondary education
Health
Health information and medical records
Health promotion and preventive care
Prescription drugs
School athletics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/3015/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s3015/BILLS-114s3015is.pdf |