US SB301 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 350,000 $1 silver coins, and 300,000 half-dollar clad coins to commemorate the centennial of the founding of Father Flanagan's Boys Town. Requires the design of the coins to be emblematic of the 100 years of Boys Town, one of the largest nonprofit child care agencies in the United States. Permits issuance of such coins only between January 1, 2017, and December 31, 2017. Subjects all coin sales to specified surcharges, which shall be paid to Boys Town to carry out its cause of caring for and assisting children and families in underserved communities across America. Directs the Secretary to ensure that: (1) minting and issuing such coins will not result in any net cost to the federal government; and (2) no funds, including surcharges, will be disbursed to Boys Town until the total cost of designing and issuing all authorized coins is recovered by the Treasury.
Title
Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-03-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S1831) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1830-1831) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB893 (Same As) 2015-07-06 - Became Public Law No: 114-30. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Child care and development
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Nebraska
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Nebraska
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations