US SB3000 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to extend until January 1, 2011, the temporary increase in the federal medical assistance percentage (FMAP), under title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, for any state with a certain unemployment increase percentage during the recession adjustment period. Extends the entire recession adjustment period from December 31, 2010, through December 31, 2011. Declares that voluntary contributions by a political subdivision to the non-federal share of expenditures under a state Medicaid plan, or to the non-federal share of payments for inpatient hospital services furnished by disproportionate share (DSH) hospitals shall not be considered to be required contributions. (Thus allows a state that otherwise requires such contributions during the recession adjustment period, but instead receives voluntary contributions from political subdivisions, to be eligible for an increase in its FMAP.)
Title
A bill to extend the increase in the FMAP provided in the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 for an additional 6 months.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Akaka [D-HI] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Roland Burris [D-IL] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Dodd [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Tom Harkin [D-IA] |
Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Edward Kaufman [D-DE] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Paul Kirk [D-MA] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. John Rockefeller [D-WV] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Arlen Specter [D-PA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4263 (Related) 2009-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5471 (Related) 2010-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB5471 (Related) 2010-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Economic performance and conditions
Hospital care
Intergovernmental relations
Medicaid
State and local finance
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/3000/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s3000/BILLS-111s3000is.pdf |