US SB30 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-331.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-331.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Truth in Caller ID Act of 2009 - Amends the Communications Act of 1934 to make it unlawful for any person in the United States, in connection with any telecommunications service or Internet protocol (IP)-enabled voice service, to cause any caller identification (ID) service to transmit misleading or inaccurate caller ID information with the intent to defraud, cause harm, or wrongfully obtain anything of value, unless such transmission is exempted in connection with: (1) authorized activities of law enforcement agencies; or (2) a court order specifically authorizing the use of caller ID manipulation. Prohibits anything in this Act from being construed as preventing or restricting any person from blocking any caller identification service. Requires a related report by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to Congress. Provides civil and criminal penalties for violations. Allows enforcement by states (with authorized intervention by the FCC). Declares that this Act does not prohibit any lawfully authorized investigative, protective, or intelligence activity of a law enforcement agency of the United States, a state, or a state's political subdivision, or of a U.S. intelligence agency.
Title
Truth in Caller ID Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | Became Public Law No: 111-331. | |
2010-12-22 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-17 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-15 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-15 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-12-15 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8377) | |
2010-12-15 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 30. | |
2010-12-15 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8376-8380) | |
2010-12-15 | Mr. Boucher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. | |
2010-02-24 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-02-24 | Received in the House. | |
2010-02-23 | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S713-714) | |
2010-02-23 | S.AMDT.3325 Amendment SA 3325 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-02-23 | S.AMDT.3325 Amendment SA 3325 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Rockefeller. (consideration: CR S713; text: CR S713)To revise the provision relating to the effect of the new subsection on other laws. | |
2010-02-23 | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S713-714) | |
2009-11-02 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194. | |
2009-11-02 | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller without amendment. With written report No. 111-96. | |
2009-08-05 | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2009-01-07 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S174) | |
2009-01-07 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S173-174) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1258 (Related) 2010-04-15 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 346.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Internet and video services
Telephone and wireless communication