US SB2983 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-12 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
U.S. Merchant Marine Academy Improvement Act of 2014 - Authorizes the Administrator of the Maritime Administration to: accept a gift of money from the U.S. Merchant Marine Academy Alumni Association and Foundation, Inc. in order to renovate Melville Hall on the campus of the U.S. Merchant Marine Academy; and enter into a contract with the Foundation for the Hall's operation.
Title
U.S. Merchant Marine Academy Improvement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-12 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-12-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6697-6698) |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6697-6698) |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5813 (Same As) 2014-12-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Marine and inland water transportation
Military education and training
New York State
Transportation and public works
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Marine and inland water transportation
Military education and training
New York State
Transportation and public works