US SB295 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amy and Vicky Child Pornography Victim Restitution Improvement Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) Amends the federal criminal code to expand the definition of "full amount of the victim's losses" for purposes of provisions governing mandatory restitution of victims of offenses involving sexual exploitation and other abuse of children to include medical services, physical and occupational therapy or rehabilitation, and lost income for the victim's lifetime, as well as any losses suffered by the victim from any sexual act or contact or sexually explicit conduct in preparation for or during the production of child pornography depicting the victim involved in the offense. Sets forth guidelines for determining restitution where the victim of of a specified child pornography offense was harmed by one defendant (requiring restitution for not less than the full amount of the victim's losses) or by more than one defendant (requiring restitution for not more than the full amount of the victim's losses and not less than specified minimum amounts for certain offenses). Requires joint and several liability where there are multiple defendants and allows each defendant who is ordered to pay restitution and who has made full payment to the victim equal to or exceeding the specified minimum amount to recover contribution from any other defendant ordered to pay. Sets forth contribution claim procedures. Requires the Attorney General to report to Congress within one year after enactment of this Act on any progress of the Department of Justice in obtaining restitution for victims of such offenses.
Title
Amy and Vicky Child Pornography Victim Restitution Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - On Passage of the Bill S. 295 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-02-12 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 55. (text: CR S920) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.250 Amendment SA 250 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.250 Amendment SA 250 proposed by Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S919; text: CR S919) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S916-920) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 16. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S602-603) |
Same As/Similar To
HB595 (Same As) 2015-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Pornography
Sex offenses
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Pornography
Sex offenses