US SB2921 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect our democracy by preventing abuses of presidential power, restoring checks and balances and accountability and transparency in government, and defending elections against foreign interference, and for other purposes.
Title
Protecting Our Democracy Act Inspector General Protection Act Inspector General Independence Act Efficient Transition Act of 2021 Hatch Act Accountability Act Accountability for Acting Officials Act Whistleblower Protection Improvement Act of 2021 Security from Political Interference in Justice Act Congressional Subpoena Compliance and Enforcement Act Foreign and Domestic Emoluments Enforcement Act No President is Above the Law Act Abuse of the Pardon Power Prevention Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Related) 2021-01-19 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2988 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2994 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
HR838 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2988 (Related) 2022-09-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2994 (Related) 2021-07-20 - Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB5314 (Related) 2021-12-13 - Received in the Senate.
HR838 (Similar To) 2021-12-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2921/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2921/BILLS-117s2921is.pdf |