US SB292 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-180.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-180.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Childhood Cancer STAR Act Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018 This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to authorize the National Institutes of Health (NIH) to provide support to collect the medical specimens and information of children, adolescents, and young adults with selected cancers that have the least effective treatments in order to achieve a better understanding of these cancers and the effects of treatment. The national childhood cancer registry is reauthorized through FY2022 and revised to authorize the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to award grants to state cancer registries to improve tracking of childhood cancers. The Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) may: (1) support pilot programs to develop or study models for monitoring and caring for childhood cancer survivors throughout their lives, (2) establish a task force to develop and test standards for high-quality childhood cancer survivorship care, and (3) carry out a demonstration project to improve care coordination as childhood cancer survivors transition to adult care. HHS must convene a Workforce Development Collaborative on Medical and Psychosocial Care for Pediatric Cancer Survivors. The NIH may support research on: (1) outcomes for, and barriers faced by, pediatric cancer survivors within minority or medically underserved populations; and (2) follow-up care for pediatric cancer survivors, including research on the late effects of cancer treatment and long-term complications. The Government Accountability Office must make recommendations to address barriers to childhood cancer survivors obtaining and paying for adequate medical care.
Title
Childhood Cancer STAR Act Childhood Cancer Survivorship, Treatment, Access, and Research Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-180. |
2018-06-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-05-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-05-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-05-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4350-4352) |
2018-05-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 292. |
2018-05-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4349-4355) |
2018-05-22 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-03-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2018-03-26 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1975-1977; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S1975-1977) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 342. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S659) |
Same As/Similar To
HB820 (Same As) 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Cancer
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Cancer
Child health
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Drug therapy
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations