US SB2895 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide for a refundable adoption tax credit.
Title
Adoption Tax Credit Refundability Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Fetterman [D-PA] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3662 (Related) 2023-05-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4789 (Related) 2023-08-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SB74 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4789 (Related) 2023-08-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SB74 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/2895/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s2895/BILLS-118s2895is.pdf |