US SB2893 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to provide for prompt payments to small business contractors, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to provide for prompt payments to small business contractors, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.

Same As/Similar To

HB5337 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
SB2894 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback