US SB2847 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-420. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-20 - By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-420. Minority views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prove It Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Chief Counsel of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to request the Office of Information and Regulatory Affairs of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB) to review any federal agency certification that a proposed rule, if promulgated, will not have a significant economic impact on a substantial number of small entities and so need not submit a regulatory flexibility analysis of the rule. The request for a review must: be published in the Federal Register and on the website of the SBA Office of Advocacy, include any documentation or comments the Chief Counsel furnished or made during the notice and comment period for the proposed rule, and explain why the Chief Counsel disagreed with the certification and statement providing the factual basis for it. Within 10 days after the request for review is published in the Federal Register, the federal agency in question shall submit to the SBA a response to the request and publish it in the Federal Register and on the agency website. If it is determined, after a specified procedure, that the proposed rule will, if promulgated, have a significant economic impact on a substantial number of small entities, the federal agency shall then perform both an initial and a final regulatory flexibility analysis for the rule.
Title
Prove It Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-20 | Senate | By Senator Vitter from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/10/2016. Report No. 114-420. Minority views filed. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Vitter without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Government information and archives
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Small business
Small Business Administration
Commerce
Economic performance and conditions
Government information and archives
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Small business
Small Business Administration