US SB2763 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-06 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Holocaust Expropriated Art Recovery Act of 2016 (Sec. 5) This bill allows civil claims or causes of action for the recovery of artwork or certain other property lost between January 1, 1933, and December 31, 1945, because of Nazi persecution to be commenced within six years after the claimant's actual discovery of: (1) the identity and location of the artwork or other property, and (2) a possessory interest in the artwork or property. Such statutory limitation period of six years after actual discovery preempts any other statutes of limitation or defenses relating to the passage of time. Preexisting claims known by a claimant before enactment of this bill shall be considered discovered on the date of this bill's enactment if they were barred before, or not barred on, the date of enactment. This bill applies to claims or actions that are: (1) pending on the date of this bill's enactment, including an action for which the time to file an appeal has not expired; or (2) filed after enactment but before 2027. But the bill does not apply to claims barred on the day before enactment of this bill if: (1) the claimant had knowledge on or after January 1, 1999, and (2) six years have passed from the date such claimant acquired such knowledge and during which time the claim was not barred by a statute of limitations.
Title
Holocaust Expropriated Art Recovery Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-06 | Senate | By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-394. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 654. |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution. Hearings held with the Committee on the Judiciary Subcommittee on Oversight, Agency Action, Federal Rights and Federal Courts. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1812-1813) |
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Civil actions and liability
Europe
Germany
Historical and cultural resources
Law
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Civil actions and liability
Europe
Germany
Historical and cultural resources
Law
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity