US SB275 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-08-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to require the Federal Communications Commission to establish a vetting process for prospective applicants for high-cost universal service program funding.
Title
Rural Broadband Protection Act of 2024
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 473. |
2024-08-01 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Cantwell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2024-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7005 (Related) 2024-01-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.