US SB274 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to nullify the effect of the recent executive order that temporarily restricted individuals from certain countries from entering the United States. This bill rescinds the provisions of Executive Order 13769, entitled "Protecting the Nation from Foreign Terrorist Entry into the United States," effective as of January 27, 2017. Among the order's major provisions are restrictions on the entry of immigrants and nonimmigrants from seven countries (Iran, Iraq, Libya, Somalia, Sudan, Syria, and Yemen) and additional limitations on refugee admissions to the United States.
Title
A bill to nullify the effect of the recent executive order that temporarily restricted individuals from certain countries from entering the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB240 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S491-492)
Subjects
Africa
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iran
Iraq
Libya
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Somalia
Sudan
Syria
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Yemen
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iran
Iraq
Libya
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Somalia
Sudan
Syria
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Yemen
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/274/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s274/BILLS-115s274pcs.pdf |