US SB2736 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018
Title
Asia Reassurance Initiative Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-19 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-19 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to S. 2736 by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7865) |
2018-12-13 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2018-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10130-10136) |
2018-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2736. |
2018-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10130-10138) |
2018-12-12 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-12-06 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7285-7291) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7278-7284) |
2018-12-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.4068 Amendment SA 4068 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | S.Amdt.4068 Amendment SA 4068 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Gardner. (consideration: CR S7284-7285; text: CR S7284-7285) To make technical edits to the bill. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7278-7291) |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 616. |
2018-10-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6888 (Related) 2018-09-25 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Australia
Aviation and airports
Burma
Cambodia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Due process and equal protection
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign property
Forests, forestry, trees
Freedom of information
Historical and cultural resources
HIV/AIDS
Human rights
Human trafficking
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intellectual property
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Japan
Law enforcement administration and funding
Malaysia
Marine and inland water transportation
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military operations and strategy
Military readiness
Multilateral development programs
Nauru
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nepal
New Zealand
News media and reporting
North Korea
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Oil and gas
Pacific Ocean
Palau
Papua New Guinea
Philippines
Political movements and philosophies
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Singapore
Smuggling and trafficking
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Taiwan
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Thailand
Tibet
Tonga
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
Tuvalu
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Vanuatu
Vietnam
Visas and passports
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
World health
Asia
Australia
Aviation and airports
Burma
Cambodia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of Defense
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Due process and equal protection
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign property
Forests, forestry, trees
Freedom of information
Historical and cultural resources
HIV/AIDS
Human rights
Human trafficking
India
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intellectual property
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Japan
Law enforcement administration and funding
Malaysia
Marine and inland water transportation
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military operations and strategy
Military readiness
Multilateral development programs
Nauru
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Nepal
New Zealand
News media and reporting
North Korea
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Oil and gas
Pacific Ocean
Palau
Papua New Guinea
Philippines
Political movements and philosophies
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Singapore
Smuggling and trafficking
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Taiwan
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Thailand
Tibet
Tonga
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
Tuvalu
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
U.S. and foreign investments
United Nations
Vanuatu
Vietnam
Visas and passports
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
World health