US SB2720 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a national clinical pathway for prostate cancer, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans’ Prostate Cancer Treatment and Research Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4880 (Same As) 2021-09-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2720/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2720/BILLS-117s2720is.pdf |