US SB272 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-28 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2015 Provides FY2015 appropriations to the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). Provides appropriations for Departmental Management and Operations for the Office of the Secretary and Executive Management, the Office of the Under Secretary for Management, the Office of the Chief Financial Officer, the Office of the Chief Information Officer, Analysis and Operations, and the Office of Inspector General. Provides appropriations for Security, Enforcement, and Investigations for U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, the Transportation Security Administration, the Coast Guard, and the U.S. Secret Service. Provides appropriations for Protection, Preparedness, Response, and Recovery for the National Protection and Programs Directorate, the Office of Health Affairs, and the Federal Emergency Management Agency. Provides appropriations for Research, Development, Training, and Services for U.S. Citizen and Immigration Services, the Federal Law Enforcement Training Center, Science and Technology, and the Domestic Nuclear Detection Office. Sets forth permissible, restricted, and prohibited uses for funds provided by this Act. Rescinds specified amounts previously appropriated to DHS.
Title
Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S872-891) |
Same As/Similar To
HB240 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-4. (TXT | PDF)
HB861 (Same As) 2015-02-11 - Referred to House Budget
HB861 (Same As) 2015-02-11 - Referred to House Budget
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Arizona
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Budget deficits and national debt
Building construction
Buy American requirements
California
Canada
Caribbean area
Child safety and welfare
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Cuba
Customs enforcement
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Disaster relief and insurance
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Floods and storm protection
Food assistance and relief
Foreign labor
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Homeland security
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mexico
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Motor carriers
National Guard and reserves
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Jersey
New Mexico
Oil and gas
Pornography
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protection of officials
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Radioactive wastes and releases
Railroads
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sex offenses
Terrorism
Texas
Transportation costs
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
Appropriations
Arizona
Aviation and airports
Border security and unlawful immigration
Budget deficits and national debt
Building construction
Buy American requirements
California
Canada
Caribbean area
Child safety and welfare
Coast guard
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crimes against children
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Cuba
Customs enforcement
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Disaster relief and insurance
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Firearms and explosives
First responders and emergency personnel
Floods and storm protection
Food assistance and relief
Foreign labor
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Homeland security
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration status and procedures
Internet and video services
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mexico
Military facilities and property
Military personnel and dependents
Motor carriers
National Guard and reserves
Navigation, waterways, harbors
New Jersey
New Mexico
Oil and gas
Pornography
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protection of officials
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Radioactive wastes and releases
Railroads
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Sex offenses
Terrorism
Texas
Transportation costs
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
User charges and fees
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/272/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s272/BILLS-114s272pcs.pdf |