US SB2693 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-29 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to improve oversight by the Federal Communications Commission of the wireless and broadcast emergency alert systems.
Title
READI Act Reliable Emergency Alert Distribution Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S5881-5882) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.2669 Amendment SA 2669 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.2669 Amendment SA 2669 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Schatz. (consideration: CR S5881-5882; text: CR S5881-5882) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5881-5882) |
2020-07-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492. |
2020-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-240. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6096 (Related) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 596.
HB4856 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB4856 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public participation and lobbying
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Congressional oversight
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public participation and lobbying
Science, technology, communications
State and local government operations
Telephone and wireless communication