US SB2673 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-296.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 113-296.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2014 - (Sec. 4) Expresses the sense of Congress that Israel is a major U.S. strategic partner. (Sec. 5) Amends the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2005 to extend authority to transfer certain obsolete or surplus Department of Defense (DOD) items to Israel. Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to extend authority to make additions to foreign-based defense stockpiles for use as war reserve stocks through FY2015. (Sec. 6) Directs the President to take steps to make Israel eligible for the strategic trade authorization exception to the requirement for a license for the export, reexport, or in-country transfer of an item subject to certain export controls. (Sec. 7) Authorizes the President to carry out U.S.-Israel cooperative activities and to provide assistance for cooperation in the fields of energy, water, agriculture, and alternative fuel technologies. Authorizes the President to: (1) share and exchange with Israel research, technology, intelligence, information, equipment, and personnel that will advance U.S. national security interests; and (2) enhance U.S.-Israel scientific cooperation. Authorizes the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to enter into cooperative research pilot programs with Israel to enhance Israel's capabilities in: (1) border, maritime, and aviation security; (2) explosives detection; and (3) emergency services. (Sec. 8) Directs the President to report to Congress regarding the feasibility and advisability of expanding U.S.-Israel cyber cooperation. (Sec. 9) States that it shall be U.S. policy to include Israel in the visa waiver program when Israel satisfies, and as long as Israel continues to satisfy, program requirements. (Sec. 10) Directs the President to update Congress on efforts taken, pursuant to the United States-Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act, to provide Israel with defense articles and defense services, including missile and joint missile defense capabilities including Iron Dome, security and intelligence cooperation, and an expanded role for Israel with the North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO). (Sec. 11) Requires any certification that a sale or export of major defense equipment to a country in the Middle East will not adversely affect Israel's qualitative military edge to include: an explanation of Israel's capacity to address the improved capabilities provided by the sale or export; an evaluation of how the sale or export alters the regional strategic and tactical balance; an identification of any new capacity or training that Israel may require to address the regional or country-specific capabilities provided by such sale or export; and a description of any additional U.S. security assurances to Israel made, or requested to be made, in connection with the sale or export. (Sec. 12) Amends the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 to authorize the Secretary of Energy to: enter into cooperative agreements supporting dialogue and planning involving international partnerships between the Department of Energy (DOE), including DOE National Laboratories, and the government of Israel and its ministries, offices, and institutions; and establish a joint United States-Israel Center in the United States with offshore energy development expertise to develop academic cooperation in energy innovation technology and engineering, water science, technology transfer, and analysis of geopolitical implications of new natural resource development. Extends through September 30, 2024, the grant program to support U.S.-Israel research, development, and commercialization of renewable energy or energy efficiency. Expands the scope of covered energy under such program, including the coverage of natural gas energy, water desalination improvement, and other water treatment technologies. Directs the Secretary of State to continue ongoing diplomacy efforts to: (1) support Israel's energy security, and (2) promote regional energy cooperation in the Eastern Mediterranean.
Title
United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-296. |
2014-12-19 | House | Signed by President. |
2014-12-10 | House | Presented to President. |
2014-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8354-8355) |
2014-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2673. |
2014-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8354-8358) |
2014-12-03 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-09-19 | House | Held at the desk. |
2014-09-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-09-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5874-5876) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | S.AMDT.3933 Amendment SA 3933 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5874; text: CR S5874) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | S.AMDT.3933 Amendment SA 3933 proposed by Senator Pryor for Senator Boxer.To designate Israel as a program country under the Visa Waiver Program if Israel complies with the generally applicable requirements. |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5874-5876) |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5321-5322) |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 492. |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural trade
Alliances
Alternative and renewable resources
Arab-Israeli relations
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Firearms and explosives
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Motor fuels
Palestinians
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Transportation safety and security
Visas and passports
Water use and supply
Agricultural trade
Alliances
Alternative and renewable resources
Arab-Israeli relations
Aviation and airports
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy research
Firearms and explosives
Foreign aid and international relief
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Motor fuels
Palestinians
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Technology transfer and commercialization
Trade restrictions
Transportation safety and security
Visas and passports
Water use and supply