US SB2665 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Information Improvement Act of 2014 - Amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act, with respect to entities that are eligible to receive certain disaster assitance, to include: (1) broadcasting facilities within the definition of a "private nonprofit facility" that provides essential services of a governmental nature to the general public, and (2) broadcast and telecommunications communications within the definition of "critical services" provided by such a facility.
Title
Emergency Information Improvement Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553. |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. With written report No. 113-250. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2647 (Related) 2013-07-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
SB1819 (Related) 2013-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1819 (Related) 2013-12-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
News media and reporting
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
News media and reporting