US SB2663 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ACRE Act Agriculture Creates Real Employment Act
Title
ACRE Act Agriculture Creates Real Employment Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works. Hearings held prior to introduction and/or referral. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-267. |
Same As/Similar To
HB368 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
HB953 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1737 (Related) 2017-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2504 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB219 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB340 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB478 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1206 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1207 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB6302 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 776.
HB953 (Related) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1737 (Related) 2017-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2504 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB219 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB340 (Related) 2017-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB478 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1206 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1207 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB6302 (Related) 2018-10-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 776.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Aquaculture
Birds
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Pest management
Seafood
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Aquaculture
Birds
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Pest management
Seafood
State and local government operations
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2663/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2663/BILLS-115s2663is.pdf |