US SB2652 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 27 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-03 - Signed by President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stephen Michael Gleason Congressional Gold Medal Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal to Stephen Michael Gleason.
Title
Stephen Michael Gleason Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 457 (Y: 390 N: 2 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 2 (Roll no. 457). (text: CR H10415) |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10436-10437) |
2018-12-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2652. |
2018-12-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10415-10416) |
2018-12-20 | House | Mr. Huizenga moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-06-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3945) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3945-3947) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5499 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Athletes
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Medical research
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Neurological disorders
Professional sports
Sports and recreation
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Medical research
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Neurological disorders
Professional sports
Sports and recreation