US SB2640 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 532.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 532.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Presidential Library Donation Reform Act of 2014 - Requires each presidential library fundraising organization to submit quarterly reports to the National Archives and Records Administration on all contributions of $200 or more whether monetary or in-kind for the quarterly period. Requires the Archivist of the United States to publish such information on the website of the National Archives within 30 days after each submission. Makes it unlawful for contributors or fundraising organizations to knowingly and willfully submit materially false information or omit material information. Prescribes criminal penalties for violation of such prohibitions.
Title
Presidential Library Donation Reform Act of 2014
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Tom Coburn [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 532. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/05/2014 with amendments. With written report No. 113-245. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1133 (Related) 2013-06-20 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 83.
Subjects
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Libraries and archives
Presidential administrations
Presidents and presidential powers
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Libraries and archives
Presidential administrations
Presidents and presidential powers