US SB2577 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of State, in accordance with the Rewards for Justice program authorized under the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956, to offer a reward of up to $5 million to any individual who furnishes information leading to the arrest or conviction in any country of any individual for committing, conspiring or attempting to commit, or aiding or abetting in the commission of, the kidnapping and murder of Naftali Fraenkel.
Title
A bill to require the Secretary of State to offer rewards totaling up to $5,000,000 for information on the kidnapping and murder of Naftali Fraenkel, a dual United States-Israeli citizen, that began on June 12, 2014.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2014-07-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5069; text as passed Senate: CR S5069) |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 474. |
2014-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez without amendment. With written report No. 113-213. |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5041 (Same As) 2014-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
SB2579 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 460.
SB2579 (Related) 2014-07-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 460.
Subjects
Arab-Israeli relations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Israel
Middle East
Violent crime
West Bank
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Israel
Middle East
Violent crime
West Bank