US SB257 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Access to Rural Therapy Services (PARTS) Act Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to state that, except with respect to high-risk or complex medical services requiring direct levels of supervision, if the Secretary of Health and Human Services requires supervision by a physician or non-physician practitioner for Medicare payment for therapeutic hospital outpatient services, that requirement is met if such services are furnished under the physician's or non-physician practitioner's general supervision. Directs the Secretary to establish a process for designating therapeutic hospital outpatient services for which direct supervision may be required for the entire service or direct supervision during the initiation of the service followed by general supervision for the remainder of the service. Declares without force or effect in law regarding Medicare requirements for direct supervision by physicians for therapeutic hospital outpatient services a specified restatement and clarification under the final rulemaking changes to the Medicare hospital outpatient prospective payment system and calendar year 2009 payment rates, which was published in the Federal Register on November 18, 2008.
Title
Protecting Access to Rural Therapy Services (PARTS) Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1611 (Same As) 2015-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3225 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3225 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Advisory bodies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/257/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s257/BILLS-114s257is.pdf |