US SB254 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Esther Martinez Native American Languages Preservation Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Native American Programs Act of 1974 to revise a grant program administered by the Administration for Native Americans at the Department of Health and Human Services to ensure the survival and continuing vitality of Native American languages. The minimum number of enrollees in educational programs funded by grants is reduced from 10 to 5 enrollees in Native American language nests and from 15 to 10 enrollees in the Native American language survival schools. The bill increases the maximum duration of grants. (Sec. 3) The program is reauthorized through FY2023.
Title
Esther Martinez Native American Languages Preservation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-11-30 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7490) |
2017-11-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.1637 Amendment SA 1637 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | S.Amdt.1637 Amendment SA 1637 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hoeven. (consideration: CR S7470; text: CR S7490) To amend the authorization of appropriations for the Native American languages grant program under section 803C of the Native American Programs Act of 1974. |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7490) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 30. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-23. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported favorably. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1169 (Same As) 2017-02-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Indian social and development programs
Native Americans